Global Patent Index - EP 1053967 A1

EP 1053967 A1 2000-11-22 - Winder

Title (en)

Winder

Title (de)

Aufspulmaschine

Title (fr)

Bobinoir

Publication

EP 1053967 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105273 A

Priority

DE 29908962 U

Abstract (en)

The coiling machine has a plate type revolver (4), located rotationally driven by a motor (6). The two spindles (7, 8) are located rotationally mirror symmetrical in relation in relation to the axis of rotation. The electric motors (9, 10) driving the spindles have integrated frequency changers (9a, 10a) to provide a regulated variable rpm. A motion transversing system (14) is provided with a common motor also provided with a frequency changer for driving the traversing motion units (15, 16, 17) at a variable rpm.

Abstract (de)

Aufspulmaschinen für kontinuierlich anlaufende Fäden sind mit drehzahlveränderlichen Motoren ausgestattet, weiche die Spindeln und die Changiervorrichtung antreiben. Durch Umrichter, die in einem separaten Schrank oder unmittelbar an der Maschine untergebracht sind, werden die Motoren mit Wechselstrom veränderlicher Frequenz versorgt. Die Kabel, welche die Umrichter mit den Motoren verbinden, müssen sorgfältig abgeschirmt werden. Bei Aufspulmaschinen, die mit einem Spulenrevolver ausgestattet sind, erfolgt die Energiezufuhr zu den auf dem Revolver sitzenden Motoren für jeden einzelnen Motor über separate Schleifringkontakte. Bei der neuen Aufspulmaschine sind die Umrichter (9a, 10a, 18a) direkt auf den Motoren (9, 10, 18) befestigt und mit ihnen durch Steckkontakte elektrisch verbunden. Die Verdrahtung des Motors (9, 10, 18) mit dem zugehörigen integrierten Umrichter (9a, 10a, 18a) beschränkt sich auf eine einfache Netzzuleitung zum Umrichter sowie eine Steuerleitung. Abgeschirmte Zuleitungen sind nicht erforderlich. Die Verlustwärme der Umrichter (9a, 10a, 18a) wird ohne zusätzlichen Aufwand abgeführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/74; B65H 54/28; B65H 54/40; B65H 67/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 54/42 (2006.01); B65H 54/74 (2006.01); B65H 67/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2881 (2013.01); B65H 54/42 (2013.01); B65H 54/74 (2013.01); B65H 67/048 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908962 U1 19990902; EP 1053967 A1 20001122; US 6286778 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021219

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI