Global patent index - EP 1053970 A3

EP 1053970 A3 2000-11-29 - Load lifting beam for a lifting apparatus, in particular vehicle crane

Title (en)

Load lifting beam for a lifting apparatus, in particular vehicle crane

Title (de)

Lastaufnahmegehänge für ein Hebezeug, insbesondere Fahrzeugkran

Title (fr)

Poutre de levage d' une charge pour un appareil de levage, en particulier grue automobile

Publication

EP 1053970 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00890157 A

Priority

AT 87899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1053970A2] At least one of the tractive device pairs(6,7) is lift adjustable relatively to the other pair via a positioning drive(8) supporting on the cross yoke(5). The positioning drive is a lift cylinder, to which engages the lift-adjustable tractive device running over a deflector roller at the cross-yoke end. Alternatively, the positioning drive can be a screw gear with a gear spin which is rotatable and drivable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60P 1/54 (2006.01); B66C 1/12 (2006.01); B66C 23/66 (2006.01); B66C 23/687 (2006.01); B66C 23/693 (2006.01); B66C 23/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1053970 A2 20001122; EP 1053970 A3 20001129; AT 409485 B 20020826; AT A87899 A 20020115; AU 4522800 A 20001205; BR 0010576 A 20020521; BR 0010576 B1 20081118; CA 2372897 A1 20001123; CA 2372897 C 20090324; DE 50004009 D1 20031113; DK 1194362 T3 20040216; EP 1194362 A1 20020410; EP 1194362 B1 20031008; ES 2208319 T3 20040616; JP 2002544099 A 20021224; JP 4692947 B2 20110601; PT 1194362 E 20040227; US 6881021 B1 20050419; WO 0069770 A1 20001123

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040415

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI