Global patent index - EP 1054072 A1

EP 1054072 A1 2000-11-22 - Nickel base superalloy

Title (en)

Nickel base superalloy

Title (de)

Nickel-Basis-Superlegierung

Title (fr)

Superalliage à base de Nickel

Publication

EP 1054072 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810443 A

Priority

EP 99810443 A

Abstract (en)

Nickel-based super alloy comprises (in wt.%) 3.0-13.0 Cr, 5.0-15.0 Co, 0-3.0 Mo, 3.5-9.5 W, 3.2-6.0 Al, 0-3.0 Ti, 2.0-10.0 T 0-6.0 Re, 0.002-0.08 C, 0-0.4 B, 0-1.4 Hf, 0-0.005 Zr, 10-60 ppm N, and a balance of Ni and impurities.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Nickel-Basis-Superlegierung, insbesondere zur Herstellung von Einkristall-Komponenten oder gerichtet erstarrten Komponenten, umfassend (gemessen in Gew.-%): 3.0-13.0% Cr, 5.0-15.0% Co, 0-3.0% Mo, 3.5-9.5% W, 3.2-6.0% Al, 0-3.0% Ti, 2.0-10.0% Ta, 0-6.0% Re, 0.002-0.08% C, 0-0.04% B, 0-1.4% Hf, 0-0.005% Zr, 10-60 ppm N, Rest Nickel mit Verunreinigungen. Durch den Zusatz von Stickstoff in definierten Mengen wird während des Erstarrens TiN gebildet und es bilden sich Karbide mit blockförmiger Morphologie. Der Kohlenstoffgehalt kann somit erhöht werden, ohne dass es zu einer Verschlechterung des Ermüdungsverhaltens bei niedrigen Lastspielzahlen und hoher Beanspruchungstemperatur kommt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 19/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/057 (2013.01); C22C 19/056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9748827 A1 19971224 - ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]
  • [A] WO 9748828 A1 19971224 - ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]
  • [A] CARUEL, F. ET AL: "SNECMA experience with cost-effective DS airfoil technology applied using CM 186 LC alloy", J. ENG. GAS TURBINES POWER (1998), 120(1), 97-104, 1998, XP002120758
  • [A] HARRIS, K. ET AL: "Development of two rhenium-containing superalloys for single-crystal blad and directionally solidified vane applications in advanced turbine engine", J. MATER. ENG. PERFORM. (1993), 2(4), 481-7, 1993, XP002120759
  • [A] QUIGG, R. J.: "New alloy developments in single crystal and DS alloys", HIGH TEMP. MATER. PROCESSES (1993), 11(1-4), 247-54, 1993, XP002120760

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054072 A1 20001122; EP 1054072 B1 20030402; DE 59904846 D1 20030508; US 6419763 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070520

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070520

2006-05-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904846

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI