Global patent index - EP 1054074 A2

EP 1054074 A2 2000-11-22 - A free machining steel bearing bismuth and sulfur with superior high temperature ductility, and manufacturing method therefor

Title (en)

A free machining steel bearing bismuth and sulfur with superior high temperature ductility, and manufacturing method therefor

Title (de)

Wismut und Schwefel enthaltenden zerspanbaren Stahl mit ausgezeichneter Dehnbarkeit bei hohen Temperaturen und Herstellungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Acier de decolletage contenant du bismuth et du soufre et présentant de ductilité excellent à haut température, et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1054074 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99303965 A

Priority

EP 99303965 A

Abstract (en)

A bismuth-sulfuric (to be called "Bi-S" below) free-machinable steel showing a superior high temperature ductility, and a manufacturing method therefor, are disclosed, in which surface defects do not occur at a low rolling temperature. The Bi-S free-machinable steel with a superior high temperature ductility includes: in wt%, 0.05-0.15% of C, 0.5-2.0% of Mn, 0.15-0.40% of S, 0.01-0.10% of P, 0.003-0.020% of O, 0.03-0.30% of Bi, 0.01% or less of Si, 0.0009% or less of Al, and a balance of Fe and other unavoidable impurities; an MnS inclusion with MnS and Bi absorbed into it; and a metallic Bi inclusion. In another aspect, the free machinable steel includes 0.02-0.1% of Ti and 0.0030-0.0100% of N in addition to the above elements. In still another aspect, the free machinable steel includes 0.0050-0.0150% of B and 0.0070% or less of N in addition to the above elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C21D 8/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054074 A2 20001122; EP 1054074 A3 20010627

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041006

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990605

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI