Global Patent Index - EP 1054078 A2

EP 1054078 A2 2000-11-22 - Sensing and checking system for the safety condition of tanks

Title (en)

Sensing and checking system for the safety condition of tanks

Title (de)

Sensor- und Überprüfungssystem für den Sicherheitszustand von Behältern

Title (fr)

Système de détection et de vérification de l'état de sécurité des réservoirs

Publication

EP 1054078 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830421 A

Priority

IT RM990188 A

Abstract (en)

A sensing and checking system (B) of the safety conditions of tanks of the type comprising a cathodic corrosion protection apparatus (A), allowing the complete automation of the sensing activities with an improved checking safety and comprising: a data recognition and output unit (16), such data including a cathodic protection voltage (Vp) and a reference value (Vt) of a cathodic protection current, having a recognition storage (18), a storing recognition code of the tank (1); and a check unit (21), connectable to said data recognition and output unit (16), apt to record the measured values of said protection voltage (Vp) and of said reference value (Vt), comprising: a main storage storing a family of identification codes and the corresponding threshold value for said protection voltage (Vp); and means for comparing (31) said measured value with said threshold value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 13/04; C23F 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 13/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054078 A2 20001122; EP 1054078 A3 20010404; IT 1306844 B1 20011011; IT RM990188 A1 20000925

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040720

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040309

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011003

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI