Global patent index - EP 1054096 A1

EP 1054096 A1 2000-11-22 - Nonwoven fabric made from filaments and artificial leather containing it

Title (en)

Nonwoven fabric made from filaments and artificial leather containing it

Title (de)

Vliesstoffbahn aus Filamenten und diese enthaltendes Kunstleder

Title (fr)

Non-tissé fait à partir de filaments et cuir synthétique comprenant ce tissu

Publication

EP 1054096 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99108697 A

Priority

EP 99108697 A

Abstract (en)

A nonwoven fabric made of filaments, which comprises filaments formed from a fiber-forming thermoplastic polymer and satisfies all of the following conditions (A) to (D). (A) The fiber bundles are present in a range of 5-70 per centimeter in any cross-section parallel to the direction of thickness of the nonwoven fabric. (B) The total area occupied by the fiber bundles is in a range of 5-70% of the cross-sectional area of any cross-section perpendicular to the direction of thickness of the nonwoven fabric. (C) The apparent density is 0.10-0.50 g/cm<3>. (D) The cut ends of the fibers on the nonwoven fabric surface are present in a range of 5-100 per mm<2> of surface area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06N 3/00; D04H 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4382 (2012.01); D04H 1/492 (2012.01); D04H 3/005 (2012.01); D04H 3/007 (2012.01); D04H 3/011 (2012.01); D04H 3/11 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01); D04H 5/02 (2012.01); D04H 11/08 (2006.01); D06N 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4382 (2013.01); D04H 1/492 (2013.01); D04H 3/005 (2013.01); D04H 3/007 (2013.01); D04H 3/011 (2013.01); D04H 3/11 (2013.01); D04H 3/16 (2013.01); D04H 5/02 (2013.01); D04H 11/08 (2013.01); D06N 3/0004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054096 A1 20001122; EP 1054096 B1 20040915; DE 69920177 D1 20041021; DE 69920177 T2 20050922

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110519

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110519

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69920177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69920177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEIJIN LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI