Global Patent Index - EP 1054097 A1

EP 1054097 A1 2000-11-22 - Papermaking fabric, in particular a dryer cloth

Title (en)

Papermaking fabric, in particular a dryer cloth

Title (de)

Papiermaschinenbespannung, insbesondere als Trockensieb

Title (fr)

Toile pour machine à papier, en particulier une toile de séchage

Publication

EP 1054097 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108201 A

Priority

DE 19923088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19923088C1] The blanket for a papermaking machine, and especially a drying section blanket (1), is of woven longitudinal filaments (4,5,12,14) and lateral ribbon filaments (2) on the paper side.. The longitudinal filaments (4,5) of the paired filaments (3) form a loop (9) with the filaments (12,14) of the neighboring pair (13,15) at the end edges of the blanket. The loops alternate with one loop (10) close to the last lateral filament ribbon (2) and one loop (9) pulled out to form a loop eyelet (11). All the loops (9) are structured to be pulled out to form a loop eyelet (11). The neighboring paired longitudinal filaments (3,13,15) give an alternate bonding with the lateral filament ribbons (2), and each filament pair (3,13,15) binds in only one lateral filament ribbon. Some lateral filaments are round and on the machine side, and others are flat ribbons (2) covering them. The round filaments are woven into place against the flat ribbons (2) by at least part of the longitudinal filaments (4,5,12,14), locking the fabric structure together. The round lateral filaments are in pairs against the flat filaments (2). The sum of the diameters of the round lateral filaments against a flat ribbon filament (2) is no more than the flat filament width along the longitudinal line of the blanket. No additional lateral filaments are next to the flat filaments (2) and the round filaments against them. Part of the longitudinal filaments bind in the flat filaments only on the paper side of the blanket, and otherwise are bonded in only with the round filaments between them and the flat filaments. In an alternative structure, at least part of the lateral filaments are in flat ribbons, with longitudinal projecting bars formed on the machine side of the blanket with a rectangular, trapezoid and/or round cross section. Two or three bars are shaped next to each other. The flat ribbon filaments (2) have a width of 1-25 mm, preferably 10-15 mm, and a thickness of 0.2-1.0 mm. The longitudinal filaments (4,5,12,14) can be flat with a width of 0.5-5.0 mm and a thickness of 0.2-1.0 mm.

Abstract (de)

Eine Papiermaschinenbespannung, insbesondere als Trockensieb (1, 21), weist eine für die Auflage einer Papierbahn vorgesehene Papierseite und eine davon abgewandte Maschinenseite auf, wobei die Papiermaschinenbespannung (1) ein Gewebe aus Längsfäden (4, 5, 12, 14, 26) und Querfäden (2, 6, 7, 22) hat oder daraus besteht und wobei jeweils zwei benachbarte Längsfäden (4, 5, 26) unter Bildung eines Längsfadenpaares (3) gleichbindig mit Querfäden (2, 6, 7, 22) einbinden. Erfindungsgemäß bildet an den Stirnkanten der Papiermaschinenbespannung (1, 21) jeweils der Längsfaden (4, 5, 26) eines Längsfadenpaares (3) mit dem benachbarten Längsfaden (12,14) des benachbarten Längsfadenpaares (13,15) eine Schlaufe (9, 10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/0054 (2013.01); D21F 1/0027 (2013.01); D21F 1/0036 (2013.01); Y10S 162/902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923088 C1 20001012; CA 2308883 A1 20001120; CA 2308883 C 20090120; EP 1054097 A1 20001122; EP 1054097 B1 20020605; ES 2177491 T3 20021216; US 6332480 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100414

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177491 T3

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000196 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI