Global Patent Index - EP 1054098 A1

EP 1054098 A1 2000-11-22 - Papermaking fabric, in particular a dryer cloth

Title (en)

Papermaking fabric, in particular a dryer cloth

Title (de)

Papiermaschinenbespannung, insbesondere als Trockensieb

Title (fr)

Toile pour machine à papier, en particulier une toile de séchage

Publication

EP 1054098 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108202 A

Priority

DE 29908887 U

Abstract (en)

The blanket for a papermaking machine has a woven structure with ribbon wefts (2) at the side towards the paper and round we filaments at the machine side. At least two of the round weft filaments (6,7) at the machine side lie against part of the ribbon weft (2) on the paper side, and both weft types are bonded together by at least part of the warp filaments (4,5,12,14). The round weft filaments against the ribbon weft (2) are next to each other. The sum of the diameters of the round weft filaments at the ribbon weft (2) does not exceed the longitudinal width along the length of the blanket (1). The blanket contains no additional wefts apart from the two round weft filaments in contact with the under surface of the ribbon wefts (2). The bonding structure of the woven material, by the warps, is only partially at the paper side, and only with round wefts between those agai the ribbon wefts. At least part of the wefts in the blanket can be ribbons with projecting longitudinal ribs, at the machine sid with a rectangular, trapezoid and/or round cross section. Two or three longitudinal ribs are formed next to each other. The widt the flat wefts, along the longitudinal line of the blanket, is 1-25 mm and preferably 10-15 mm and they have a thickness of 0.2- mm. The warps (4,5,12,14) can have a flat structure with a width on the lateral line of the blanket of 0.5-5.0 mm and with a thickness of 0.2-1.0 mm. The warps (4,5,12,14) bind in only one ribbon weft (2). With at least part of the warps (4,5,12,14), ea neighboring pair of warps (4,5) form warp pairs (3,13,15) in an identical bonding with the wefts (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Papiermaschinenbespannung, insbesondere als Trockensieb (1), mit einer für die Auflage einer Papierbahn vorgesehenen Papierseite und einer davon abgewandten Maschinenseite, wobei die Papiermaschinenbespannung (1) ein Gewebe aus Längs- und Querfäden (2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 12, 14) hat oder daraus besteht und die Querfäden ein papierseitiges Fadensystem aus Flachquerfäden (2) und ein maschinenseitiges Fadensystem aus Rundquerfäden (6, 7) ausbildet, welche dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß jeweils wenigstens zwei Rundquerfäden (6, 7) an der Maschinenseite an zumindest einem Teil der Flachquerfäden (2) anliegen und jeweils ein Flachquerfaden (2) und seine an ihm anliegenden Rundquerfäden (6, 7) von zumindest einem Teil der Längsfäden (4, 5, 12, 14) gemeinsam eingebunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/00 (2006.01); D21F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/0088 (2013.01); D21F 1/0036 (2013.01); D10B 2331/04 (2013.01); D10B 2331/061 (2013.01); D10B 2331/301 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908887 U1 20000706; AT 218646 T 20020615; CA 2308926 A1 20001120; CA 2308926 C 20081125; EP 1054098 A1 20001122; EP 1054098 B1 20020605; ES 2177492 T3 20021216; PT 1054098 E 20021031; US 6378565 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101014

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100414

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THOMAS JOSEF *HEIMBACH G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-04-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-02-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1054098E

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177492 T3

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-09-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000197 20020711

2002-07-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218646 T 20020615

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI