Global Patent Index - EP 1054102 A2

EP 1054102 A2 2000-11-22 - Process and apparatus for controlling or regulating the basis weight of a paper- or board web

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for controlling or regulating the basis weight of a paper- or board web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung oder Regelung des Flächengewichts einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la commande ou la régulation du poids de base d'une bande de papier ou carton

Publication

EP 1054102 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107662 A

Priority

DE 19922817 A

Abstract (en)

To control the weight of a paper or cardboard web during its production, at least one adjustable web weight control system (20,21) is set by a control circuit together with at least one web weight sensor (7). An additional control circuit has at least sensor (10) to register the concentration of the extracted water from the wet web. At least one web weight adjustment system has a number of adjustable units distributed across the machine width, and at lea one is the setting unit for the additional control circuit. At least one sensor to register the concentration of the extracted water in front of or in the extracted water container, or at the return flow channel of the water to the stock inlet. The second contr circuit is connected to the setting units of the first control circuit. At least one web weight sensor is at the machine drying section, and preferably at the end of the drying station. Or the sensor is between the press and drying sections, and preferably directly after the press station. In a further control circuit, after detection of a change in the retention, a correction is ma to the fiber suspension concentration laid on the fourdrinier or between two fourdriniers. The retention detection is through measurement of the extracted water from the pulp, and its concentration, in front of the extracted water container or in the ret flow channel to the stock inlet. The additional control circuit is subordinate to the first control circuit, and uses the settin units of the first control circuit. On detection of a decline in the retention, the concentration is increased in the pulp suspension fed to the stock inlet and added retention agents, and vice versa. The stock inlet is divided into sections across th machine width, for its control according to the measurements of the extracted water.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Steuerung oder Regelung des Flächengewichtes einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn im Herstellungsprozeß einer Papier- oder Kartonmaschine mit einem ersten Regelkreis zur Einstellung des Flächengewichtes mit mindestens einem einstellbaren Mittel (20, 21) zur Beeinflussung des Flächengewichts und mindestens einem Flächengewichtssensor. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß ein weiterer Regelkreis mit mindestens einem Sensor zur Bestimmung der Konzentration des anfallenden Siebwassers vorgesehen ist. Weiterhin betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zur Steuerung oder Regelung des Flächengewichts einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn im Herstellungsprozeß, mit einem ersten Regelkreis der das Flächengewicht der Bahn mit Hilfe mindestens einer Flächegewichtsmessung und mindestens einem Mittel zur Beeinflussung des Flächengewichtes einstellt. Das Verfahren ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß in einem weiteren Regelkreis nach der Detektion einer Retentionsänderung der Retentionsänderung durch Beeinflussung der Konzentration der auf das Sieb aufgelegten oder zwischen die Siebe eingebrachten Stoffsuspension entgegengewirkt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00; D21F 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/08 (2006.01); D21F 1/66 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0027 (2013.01); D21F 1/08 (2013.01); D21F 1/66 (2013.01); Y10S 162/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054102 A2 20001122; EP 1054102 A3 20010502; DE 19922817 A1 20001123; US 2003089479 A1 20030515; US 6521089 B1 20030218

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20060805

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI