Global patent index - EP 1054108 A2

EP 1054108 A2 2000-11-22 - Post arrangement

Title (en)

Post arrangement

Title (de)

Pfostenvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Conception d'un poteau

Publication

EP 1054108 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303865 A

Priority

GB 9911425 A

Abstract (en)

A motor 84 is actuated to cause an arm 86 to move in a clockwise direction. This movement causes a bush 94 of the link 90 to move in an upwards direction, to the right. Rotation of the motor is continued until the position shown in Figure 10 is reached. The motor maintains the post in the raised position. Should the post be rammed a support member 34 will be raised and latched in position. A pin 100 is fractured and sacrificed when the pin is rammed as a result of shock loading to a bush 94. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/08 (2006.01); E01F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/123 (2013.01); E01F 13/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054108 A2 20001122; EP 1054108 A3 20020710; GB 2350387 A 20001129; GB 2350387 B 20030611; GB 9911425 D0 19990714

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030111

2003-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 01F 13/06 A, 7E 01F 13/08 B, 7E 01F 13/12 B

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI