Global patent index - EP 1054112 A1

EP 1054112 A1 2000-11-22 - Device for floor drain

Title (en)

Device for floor drain

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für einen Bodenablauf

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour un drain de sol

Publication

EP 1054112 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110009 A

Priority

SE 9901764 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a device for permitting connection of a soil pipe from a toilet to a floor drain without an original coupling therefor. To this end, the device comprises an adapter (5) having a first tubular portion (6) which, after removal of grating, clamping ring and water trap present in the inlet member (2) of the floor drain (1), is insertable into the inlet member (2), and a second tubular portion (7) into which said soil pipe is insertable. A tubular transition portion (8) connects said first and second tubular portions (6, 7) to each other. On the outer side of the transition portion (8), there is a cover means (9) which, when the adapter (5) has been located in the floor drain (1), covers the gap (10) thereby defined between the adapter (5) and the floor drain (1) and engages the floor around the floor drain (1). Finally, the adapter (5) can be located in the floor drain (1) resting therein on a limit stop provided on the outer side of the transition portion (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054112 A1 20001122; NO 20002430 A 20001120; NO 20002430 D0 20000510; NO 325308 B1 20080325; SE 518894 C2 20021203; SE 9901764 D0 19990517; SE 9901764 L 20001118

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-31 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20070625

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040715

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI