Global Patent Index - EP 1054114 A2

EP 1054114 A2 2000-11-22 - Modular construction system for masonry with bricks for facades, walls, pillars, lintels and interior vertical or horizontal conduits

Title (en)

Modular construction system for masonry with bricks for facades, walls, pillars, lintels and interior vertical or horizontal conduits

Title (de)

Modulares Konstruktionssystem für Mauerwerk aus Ziegeln für Fassaden, Mauern, Stützen, Stürze und innenliegenden vertikalen oder horizontalen Leitungen

Title (fr)

Système de construction modulaire pour maçonnerie avec des briques aux façades, murs, cloisons, piliers, linteaux et conduites intérieures, verticales et horizontales

Publication

EP 1054114 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00500065 A

Priority

ES 9901046 A

Abstract (en)

Double module (4) has same width as basic module, but has length slightly longer than twice length of basic module. Double module has two cylindrical studs (8), and two cylindrical cavities (8a), placed on symmetrical axis of module. Gap between axis of studs/cavities is constant so that basic and double modules can be used together. Diameter of cavity is slightly larger than diameter of stud so as to allow stud to be inserted in cavity of next module. He of stud is smaller than height of cavity so as to allow binding material to be inserted between stud and cavity. Module can be m of ceramics, silica-limestone component, plaster or gypsum, concrete, artificial stone, glass, artificial resin, industrial rubb industrial fibers, etc.

Abstract (fr)

Il consiste en avoir des éléments modulaires pour conformer des assises qui constitueront les appareils à construire, lesdits éléments ayant une forme prismatique régulière et des dimensions pré-établies, ce module basique unitaire est en matériau résistant et pourvu, sur sa surface supérieure, d'un téton cylindrique émergent, et sur sa surface inférieure d'une cavité cylindrique, tous deux étant situés coaxialement à l'axe vertical imaginaire central du module, le diamètre de la cavité étant un peu plus grand que celui du téton, de sorte que celui-ci peut être facilement emboîté dans la cavité correspondante du module qui sera placé au-dessus, la hauteur du téton étant plus petite que celle du la cavité pour y placer le matériau à jointoyer. Une variante essentielle, sera de prévoir un module basique double, à la longueur équivalant à celle de deux modules unitaires plus la grosseur correspondant au joint vertical ou à l'épaisseur du matériau

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/08 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/08 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0223 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0263 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054114 A2 20001122; EP 1054114 A3 20020320; ES 2157790 A1 20010816; ES 2157790 B1 20020216

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020921

2003-01-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI