Global Patent Index - EP 1054115 A1

EP 1054115 A1 2000-11-22 - Building block for making angled walls

Title (en)

Building block for making angled walls

Title (de)

Baublock zum Herstellen abgewinkelter Mauern

Title (fr)

Bloc de construction destiné à la réalisation d'un angle de mur de bâtiment.

Publication

EP 1054115 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420102 A

Priority

FR 9906674 A

Abstract (en)

Building block (1) comprises convex-shaped section (2), concave-shaped section (3) and breakable intermediate section (4). Concave section is placed against convex section so as to define desired angle. Block is delivered in one piece to building site, and broke into two parts along intermediate section when needed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/12; E04B 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/12 (2006.01); E04B 2/14 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/12 (2013.01); E04B 2/14 (2013.01); E04B 2002/026 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0263 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054115 A1 20001122; FR 2793826 A1 20001124; FR 2793826 B1 20010713

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060224

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040907

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMERYS STRUCTURE

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI