Global Patent Index - EP 1054117 A2

EP 1054117 A2 2000-11-22 - Constructional element and constructional element system

Title (en)

Constructional element and constructional element system

Title (de)

Konstruktionselement und Konstruktionselementsystem

Title (fr)

Elément de construction et système d'élément de construction

Publication

EP 1054117 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304256 A

Priority

GB 9911704 A

Abstract (en)

A constructional element system (12) for a building comprises a composite panel (14) of thermally insulating material, which has a recess (24a, 24b, 24c) in an outer face thereof, and first and second fixing means (34, 44, 49) for fixing the panel (14) to a purlin (18) at the interior of the building and for fixing a facing (16) at an outer side of the panel respectively. In one embodiment, the respective heads (50) of the first and second fixing means are both received in a lipped channel section (46) in the recess, with a stem of the first fixing means (34) passing through a thermal break (36), the channel section (46) and the panel (14) to extend to the purlin (18). A threaded stem (54) of the second fixing means (49) extends out of the recess between the lips of the channel section (46) and through an opening in a bracket (56) attached to the facing (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054117 A2 20001122; EP 1054117 A3 20011010; GB 9911704 D0 19990721

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041223

2002-07-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020408

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04F 13/08 A, 7E 04H 5/10 B

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI