Global Patent Index - EP 1054122 A1

EP 1054122 A1 2000-11-22 - Clip for fixing fence panels on grooved profiles

Title (en)

Clip for fixing fence panels on grooved profiles

Title (de)

Klammer zur Befestigung von Zaunelementen an Rilleprofilen

Title (fr)

Clip de fixation de panneaux de clôture sur des profilés à feuillure

Publication

EP 1054122 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99450010 A

Priority

EP 99450010 A

Abstract (en)

Clamp (9) has first part (9a) resting against bottom (6) of receiving feather edge (5), and second part (9b) with slot (12) able to be secured on horizontal rod (11). Second part of clamp also comprises spikes (15) avoiding any sliding of second part along restraining projection (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/161 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2698417 A1 19940527 - PLASTIL [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054122 A1 20001122; EP 1054122 B1 20040317; DE 69915596 D1 20040422; DE 69915596 T2 20041111; ES 2217714 T3 20041101; PT 1054122 E 20040831

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090417

2009-08-26 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20090417

2005-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CLOETURES MICHEL WILLOQUAUX

2005-01-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CLOETURES MICHEL WILLOQUAUX

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217714 T3

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401967

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915596 P 20040422

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

2001-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIPPI LA CLOTURE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI