Global Patent Index - EP 1054127 A2

EP 1054127 A2 2000-11-22 - Fitting for pivotally mounting a wing to a frame

Title (en)

Fitting for pivotally mounting a wing to a frame

Title (de)

Beschlag zur Drehlagerung eines Flügels an einem Blendrahmen

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour montage pivotant d'un vantail sur un dormant

Publication

EP 1054127 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110711 A

Priority

DE 29908966 U

Abstract (en)

The fixture is for the rotary location of a pane or panel in an arch frame and has an arm (1) in ended for installation on t upper horizontal rabbet surface of the pane or panel and a movable bearing part (5) forming part of a rotary bearing with a vert rotary axis. A bearing angle (3) connects the arm with the movable bearing part and has horizontal and vertical legs (30,40). The arm (1) lies flatly on the horizontal leg (30) of the bearing angle (3). On the horizontal leg of the bearing angle is least one upwardly bent finger, which acts in conjunction with a corresponding recess of the arm to move the arm longitudinally. adjustment screw (7) is rotatably fitted in a stamped-out recess in the horizontal leg of the bearing angle and is supported immovably in the longitudinal direction.

Abstract (de)

Ein Beschlag zur Drehlagerung eines Fenster- oder Türflügels an einem Blendrahmen hat einen zur Befestigung am Flügel bestimmten horizontalen Tragarm 1, der über einen Lagerwinkel 3 mit dem beweglichen Lagerteil 5 eines Drehlagers (Scharniers) verbunden ist. Der Tragarm 1 liegt flach auf dem waagerechten Schenkel des Lagerwinkels 3 auf, ist dort durch mindestens einen nach oben abgebogenen Finger 31, 32 des Lagerwinkels 3 längsverschieblich geführt und mit dem Lagerwinkel 3 durch eine dessen waagerechten Schenkel 30 untergreifende Führungsmutter 8 verbunden. Mit der Führungsmutter 8 wirkt eine Einstellschraube 7 zusammen, die in einer Ausnehmung 33 im waagerechten Schenkel 30 des Lagerwinkels 3 drehbar und in Längsrichtung unverschiebbar eingelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05D 15/5205 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9848136 A2 19981029 - FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908966 U1 20001005; EP 1054127 A2 20001122; EP 1054127 A3 20021127; EP 1054127 B1 20031022; ES 2208180 T3 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070519

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080131

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060520

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060519

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060520

2006-05-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060519

2006-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050503

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2208180

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040206

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004128

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI