Global patent index - EP 1054128 A2

EP 1054128 A2 2000-11-22 - Safety arrangement for vehicle doors

Title (en)

Safety arrangement for vehicle doors

Title (de)

Sicherheitsanordnung für Fahrzeugtüren

Title (fr)

Agencement de sécurité pour portes de véhicules

Publication

EP 1054128 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00850089 A

Priority

SE 9901899 A

Abstract (en)

A safety arrangement for vehicle doors (2) which are operated by a pressure medium, which arrangement limits the risk of a person's becoming trapped in a bus door with consequent risk of personal injury. The invention brings about a temporary reduction in the air pressure in the door machinery (14). The pressure is reduced during the door closing process and reverts to full pressure when the vehicle exceeds a certain limit speed. This function reduces the risk of injury and makes it easier for someone who becomes trapped, e.g. between door and bodywork while alighting, to free him/herself. It is also possible for another passenger to push the door open and free the trapped person. The desired function is achieved by leading the pressure medium from the pressure tanks (3) to the door machinery (14) via a pressure limiting value (10) at the time of door opening and by thereafter allowing the air to flow through a different clear passage (11,13), resulting in full pressure, when the doors have closed and the vehicle has reached a certain speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/00; E05F 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/02 (2006.01); F15B 11/028 (2006.01); F15B 20/00 (2006.01); E05F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 20/00 (2013.01); E05F 15/50 (2013.01); F15B 11/028 (2013.01); E05F 15/49 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/506 (2013.01); F15B 2211/212 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30525 (2013.01); F15B 2211/327 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/41509 (2013.01); F15B 2211/426 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50554 (2013.01); F15B 2211/55 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6346 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6653 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/8643 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054128 A2 20001122; EP 1054128 A3 20011219; EP 1054128 B1 20040407; DE 60009599 D1 20040513; DE 60009599 T2 20050421; SE 516950 C2 20020326; SE 9901899 D0 19990521; SE 9901899 L 20001122

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120518

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60009599

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120518

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120518

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-02-09 [REG GB 711G] CORRECTION ALLOWED (SECT. 117/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 711G

2005-02-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-08 [REG GB 711B] APPLICATION MADE FOR CORRECTION OF ERROR (SECT. 117/77)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 711B

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60009599

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI