Global Patent Index - EP 1054131 A2

EP 1054131 A2 2000-11-22 - Glue-laminated wooden construction elements

Title (en)

Glue-laminated wooden construction elements

Title (de)

Bauteile aus verleimten Dünnschichtlagen

Title (fr)

Pièces de charpente en bois stratifié-collé

Publication

EP 1054131 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110673 A

Priority

  • EP 00110673 A
  • EP 99109806 A

Abstract (en)

The wooden structural part for a building comprises several superimposed, stacked, glued thin sheet layers (1,2), in which e second layer is formed as a frame of strip-shaped layer sheets (1a,1b). The outer edges surrounding each layer are aligned with the outer edges (1a'-2b') of at least one adjacent layer. The blunt abutment between adjacent layer sheets of a frame-shaped layer is overlapped by a layer sheet of the adjacent layer (2).

Abstract (de)

Ein Holzbauteil, der aus einer Vielzahl übereinander stapelweise verleimten Dünnschichtlagen (1, 2) besteht, wobei zumindest jede zweite Lage (1, 2) als Rahmen aus streifenförmigen Schichtblättern (1a, 1b) ausgebildet ist, die jede Lage umlaufende Aussenkante mit den Aussenkanten (1a', 1b'', 2a'', 2b') zumindest einer benachbarten Lage fluchtet, und der stumpfe Stoss zwischen aneinander grenzende Schichtblätter (1a, 1b) einer rahmenförmigen Lage von einem Schichtblatt der benachbarten Lage (2) überlappt wird. Die neuen vorgeschlagenen Holzbauteile zeichnen sich durch ausgezeichnete Festigkeit und Stehvermögen aus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/96; E06B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/10 (2006.01); E06B 3/984 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/984 (2013.01); E06B 3/10 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054131 A2 20001122; EP 1054131 A3 20001129

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040607

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010428

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI