Global patent index - EP 1054145 A2

EP 1054145 A2 2000-11-22 - Engine generator unit

Title (en)

Engine generator unit

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine-Generator-Baueinheit

Title (fr)

Combinaison moteur-genérateur

Publication

EP 1054145 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00110646 A

Priority

  • JP 14071599 A
  • JP 14237899 A

Abstract (en)

In an engine generator unit, an engine (40) is connected with an outer-rotor/magnet type generator that has a cantilevered outer rotor (54) functioning also as a substitute for an engine fly wheel. Cooling fan device (60) is attached to the outer rotor (54). The generator (50) and cooling fan device (60) are covered with a fan cover (80) that is made of die-cast aluminum alloy. The fan cover (80) has, at its one end remote from the engine (40), a cooling-air inlet portion (81) for introducing cooling air from the outside via the cooling fan device (60), and a recoil starter (70) is attached to the cooling-air inlet portion (81). Also, the fan cover (80) is connected at its other end to the engine (40) with a gap formed therebetween for blowing the cooling air onto an outer peripheral surface of the engine (40). Supporting leg members (43, 84) are secured to the fan cover (80) and engine (40), and these leg members (43, 84) are also mounted to a framework (11) via shock-absorbing members (44, 85). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 63/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/04 (2013.01); F02B 75/16 (2013.01); F02B 63/048 (2013.01); F02B 2063/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0596543 U 19931227

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054145 A2 20001122; EP 1054145 A3 20020102; EP 1054145 B1 20040915; DE 60013690 D1 20041021; DE 60013690 T2 20050210

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130518

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60013690

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130518

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60013690

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030818

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020128

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI