Global Patent Index - EP 1054147 A2

EP 1054147 A2 2000-11-22 - Engine generator unit

Title (en)

Engine generator unit

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine-Generator-Baueinheit

Title (fr)

Combinaison moteur-genérateur

Publication

EP 1054147 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00110662 A

Priority

  • JP 14071599 A
  • JP 14236999 A

Abstract (en)

Muffler (102) connected to the exhaust-discharging end of an engine (40) is positioned above the engine (40) adjacent a fuel tank (90). Heat blocking cover (121) covers top and side portions of the muffler (102), and a fan cover (80), generally in the shape of a cylinder and extending close to the engine (40), covers an electric-power generator (50). Cooling fan device (60) is provided in a cooling-air inlet portion (81) of the fan cover (80) for introducing cooling air from the outside to the electric-power generator (50) covered with the fan cover (80). Engine-cooling air passage (112) having a cooling-air inlet portion (112a) that faces a cooling-air outlet portion (87) of the fan cover (80) is provided to cool an outer surface of the engine (40) by the cooling air flowing out through the cooling-air outlet portion (87) of the fan cover (80). The engine-cooling air passage (112) is branched upward to provide a separate muffler-cooling air passage (126) extending between the muffler (102) and the heat blocking cover (121) above the engine (40). Thus, the cooling air introduced from the outside is allowed to cool both the engine (40) and the muffler (102) after having cooled the electric-power generator (50). With such arrangements, the engine (40), generator (50) and muffler (102) can be cooled with enhanced efficiency in a very simple manner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 63/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/16 (2013.01); F02B 63/04 (2013.01); F02B 63/048 (2013.01); F02B 2063/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054147 A2 20001122; EP 1054147 A3 20020102; EP 1054147 B1 20050727; DE 60021471 D1 20050901; DE 60021471 T2 20060112

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021471 P 20050901

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030821

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020128

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI