Global Patent Index - EP 1054154 A2

EP 1054154 A2 2000-11-22 - Device for the measuring of an ion current for an internal-combustion engine

Title (en)

Device for the measuring of an ion current for an internal-combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erfassung eines Ionenstromes für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la mesure d'un courant d'ions pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1054154 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107750 A

Priority

DE 19922747 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a measurement voltage generator (1) connected to an ignition current bypass (2) and a measurement signal converter (4) connected to the measurement voltage generator and bypass. The current to voltage converter has an operational amplifier with negative input connected to the measurement voltage generator, ignition current bypass and, via a resistance, to output. Its positive input is connected a slightly higher potential (earth).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Erfassung eines Ionenstromes für eine Brennkraftmaschine, umfassend eine Meßspannungserzeugungseinrichtung, einen mit der Meßspannungserzeugungseinrichtung verbundenen Zündstrombypass und einen mit der Meßspannungserzeugungseinrichtung und dem Zündstrombypass verbundenen Meßsignalkonverter. Um ein möglichst fahrzeuggerecht aufbereitetes Ionenstrommeßsignal erzeugen zu können, wird vorgeschlagen, als Meßsignalkonverter einen Strom-/Spannungskonverter zu verwenden, der aus einem Operationsverstärker besteht, dessen negativer Eingang mit der Meßspannungserzeugungseinrichtung, dem Zündstrombypass und über einen Widerstand mit dessen Ausgang, welcher das Meßsignal liefert, verbunden ist und dessen positiver Eingang auf Masse oder auf einem leicht erhöhten Potential liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 17/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054154 A2 20001122; EP 1054154 A3 20020821; EP 1054154 B1 20100120; DE 19922747 A1 20001130; DE 19922747 C2 20030206; DE 50015847 D1 20100311

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015847

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015847

2010-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101021

2010-10-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100120

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100602

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015847 P 20100311

2010-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2010-01-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060413

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI