Global Patent Index - EP 1054209 A2

EP 1054209 A2 2000-11-22 - Lighting fixture with high antiglare properties

Title (en)

Lighting fixture with high antiglare properties

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinrichtung mit ausgeprägten Blendeschutz-Eigenschaften

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' éclairage ayant des propriétés anti-éblouissantes importantes

Publication

EP 1054209 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201700 A

Priority

IT MI991075 A

Abstract (en)

A lighting fixture with high antiglare properties, comprising an outer enclosure (21, 31) capable of being mounted on a wall or ceiling, associated with at least one profiled reflecting element, (40,50) so as to outwardly diffuse a light flux originating from at least one light source (12). The peculiarity of this invention consists in that the lighting fixture provides at least one reflecting antiglare surface (13) opposed to the light source (12) and placed inside the profiled reflecting element (40, 50) in such a position that the light source (12) is not directly visible. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/04; F21V 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/04 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 11/16 (2006.01); F21V 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/04 (2013.01); F21S 8/033 (2013.01); F21V 7/0016 (2013.01); F21V 7/0025 (2013.01); F21V 11/16 (2013.01); F21V 13/10 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054209 A2 20001122; EP 1054209 A3 20030212; EP 1054209 B1 20050216; DE 60018129 D1 20050324; DE 60018129 T2 20060413; IT 1312450 B1 20020417; IT MI991075 A1 20001117

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-02 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070511

2006-05-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060508

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60018129 P 20050324

2005-03-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI