Global Patent Index - EP 1054210 A2

EP 1054210 A2 2000-11-22 - Motor vehicle headlamp of the projection type

Title (en)

Motor vehicle headlamp of the projection type

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer nach dem Projektionstyp für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Phare du type projecteur pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 1054210 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304175 A

Priority

CZ 173899 A

Abstract (en)

A two-functional projecting headlamp with modes for a dipped and a long-distance light beams comprised of a light source (1), an internal reflector (2), an external reflector (3), an objective (4) an internal shade (51), external shades (61) and (62), a frame (7), an electric part (8) and a moving mechanism (9), where in the dipped mode the internal shade (51) is projected on a road surface by means of an objective (4) on a light background of said internal reflector (2) and produces so a boundary between light and darkness and said external shades (61), (62) obstruct the path of rays emitted by said source (1) in the direction to said external reflector (3) and in the long-distance mode said switching mechanism (9) fixed to said frame (7) moves all shades into such positions where none of said shades obstructs the path of the outgoing light beam and on the road surface two light traces, the one produced by the internal (2) and the one produced by external (3) reflectors, are added. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21W 101/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 13/04 (2006.01); B60Q 1/04 (2006.01); B60Q 1/16 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2015.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1364 (2013.01); F21S 48/1388 (2013.01); F21S 48/1778 (2013.01); F21S 48/125 (2013.01); F21W 2101/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054210 A2 20001122; EP 1054210 A3 20020220; EP 1054210 B1 20060705; CZ 9901738 A3 20010117; DE 60029163 D1 20060817; DE 60029163 T2 20070628; ES 2277585 T3 20070716

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070518

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070518

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070517

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070517

2007-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2277585

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070410

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-11-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VISTEON-AUTOPAL, S.R.O.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60029163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-08-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-07-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-01-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 8/10 20000101AFI20051118BHEP

2006-01-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21W 101/10 20000101ALI20051118BHEP

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040112

2002-11-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI