Global patent index - EP 1054219 A1

EP 1054219 A1 2000-11-22 - Method for arranging ventilation and a ventilation arrangement

Title (en)

Method for arranging ventilation and a ventilation arrangement

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lüftung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de ventilation

Publication

EP 1054219 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00660094 A

Priority

FI 991157 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method for arranging ventilation in a room space, particularly a restaurant space, and a respective ventilation arrangement. The room space is divided into areas designated for smokers and non-smokers. According to the invention, at the border (4; 4a) of said areas, in the ceiling structures (5), there is arranged a downwardly directed air flow stop (6; 6a, 6b), and the air exhaust from the room space is arranged to take place at least partly in the vicinity of said stop (6; 6a, 6b). In said stop (6; 6a, 6b), there is provided a number of exhaust air apertures (8; 8a, 8b), which are connected to an exhaust air apparatus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 9/00 (2013.01); F24F 2003/1646 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2180054 A 19870318 - HOLWAY JOHN WALTER
  • [A] EP 0362958 A1 19900411 - BIDDLE F H BV [NL]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 027 (M - 662) 27 January 1988 (1988-01-27)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 01 29 January 1999 (1999-01-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054219 A1 20001122; FI 112533 B 20031215; FI 991157 A0 19990521; FI 991157 A 20001122; NO 20002573 A 20001122; NO 20002573 D0 20000519

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040614

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE DK FI GB SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI GB SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI