Global patent index - EP 1054228 A2

EP 1054228 A2 2000-11-22 - Device for loading bullets into a magazine and for feeding them into the cartridge chamber of a firearm

Title (en)

Device for loading bullets into a magazine and for feeding them into the cartridge chamber of a firearm

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Magazinieren von Geschosskugeln und zum Zuführen derselben zur Geschosskammer einer Handfeuerwaffe

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour charger un magasin avec des balles et pour transporter ces balles vers la chambre à cartouche d'une arme à feu

Publication

EP 1054228 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104822 A

Priority

DE 19922589 A

Abstract (en)

Paintballs held in a magazine (3) are ejected by the action of an electric motor (10) coupled (11) to a feeder (8). A series of paintballs are thus fed out of the magazine and, through a flexible delivery tube (2), supplied to the weapon. A conveyor moves a closed series of bullets out of the container into the delivery tube. To maintain a delivery force a spring device (6) is provided and the motor may be intermittently switched on when a predetermined delivery force and spring movement path is not achieved or exceeded.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Magazinieren von Geschoßkugeln und zum Zuführen derselben zur Geschoßkammer einer Handteuerwaffe (1) mit einem Kugelbehälter (3), einem daran angeschlossenen und zur Waffe (1) führenden Förderrohr (2) und einem Förderer zum Fördern einer geschlossenen Kugelreihe aus dem Kugelbehälter (3) in das Förderrohr. Zur Aufrechterhaltung der Förderkraft ist eine Federeinrichtung vorgesehen, deren Federweg mindestens so groß ist wie der Durchmesser einer Kugel. Ferner ist eine Einrichtung (57) zum intermittierenden Einschalten des Motors (10) beim Unter- bzw. Überschreiten einer vorbestimmten Förderkraft bzw. eines vorbestimmten Federwegs vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41B 11/02; F41A 9/73

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/02 (2006.01); F41A 9/73 (2006.01); F41B 11/00 (2006.01); F41B 11/02 (2006.01); F41B 11/52 (2013.01); F41B 11/53 (2013.01); F41B 11/57 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41B 11/57 (2013.01); F41A 9/02 (2013.01); F41A 9/73 (2013.01); F41B 11/53 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054228 A2 20001122; EP 1054228 A3 20011212; DE 19922589 A1 20001207; US 6327953 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 41B 11/02 A, 7F 41A 9/73 B, 7F 41A 9/02 B

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI