Global Patent Index - EP 1054231 A2

EP 1054231 A2 2000-11-22 - Actuation system for an aerodynamic control surface of an air vehicle

Title (en)

Actuation system for an aerodynamic control surface of an air vehicle

Title (de)

Stelleinrichtung für Ruder eines Flugkörpers

Title (fr)

Système d'actionnement pour gouverne aérodynamique d'un engin volant

Publication

EP 1054231 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110018 A

Priority

DE 19922693 A

Abstract (en)

The control surface is displaced by servomotors via thrust spindles. The servomotors are arranged in a carrier housing in th missile. The stators (7) of the servomotors (5,6) are arranged directly on the carrier housing (4). The thrust spindles (15) eng with the internal thread of the motor shaft (9). The internal thread lies within a roller bearing of the motor shaft. The roller bearing (10) comprises an inner ring (13) and an outer ring (12) which rest in the carrier housing during the launching accelera of the missile.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Stelleinrichtung für Ruder eines Flugkörpers sind die Ruder 2,3 von Stellmotoren 5,6 über Schubspindeln 15 verstellbar. Für eine kompakte Bauweise bei kleinem Gewicht sind die Statoren 7 der Stellmotoren 5,6 unmittelbar in einem Trägergehäuse 4 angeordnet und die Schubspindel 15 greift in ein Innengewinde 14 der Motorwelle 9 ein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/64 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054231 A2 20001122; EP 1054231 A3 20020612; EP 1054231 B1 20051130; DE 19922693 A1 20001123; DE 50011724 D1 20060105; US 6299101 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160512

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160512

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160512

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011724

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060202

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011724 P 20060105

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO.KG

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI