Global Patent Index - EP 1054238 A2

EP 1054238 A2 2000-11-22 - Method and apparatus for detecting position using phase-shifted signals

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for detecting position using phase-shifted signals

Title (de)

Verfahren und Gerät zur Messung der Position unter Verwendung von phasenverschobenen Signalen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de détection de données positionelles utilisant de signaux décalés

Publication

EP 1054238 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00110444 A

Priority

JP 13924299 A

Abstract (en)

First A.C. output signals (sin( omega t+)) having an electric phase angle shifted in a positive direction in accordance with a position-to-be-detected is produced along with a second A.C. output signal (sin( omega t-)) having an electric phase angle shifted in a negative direction. First and second detection data are generated by detecting respective phase differences (+ and -) of the first and second A.C. output signals from a predetermined reference phase. First predicted value is provided on the basis of at least two successive samples of the first detection data, and a second predicted value is provided on the basis of at least two successive samples of the second detection data. The first and second predicted values are modified to provide a standard predicted value for correcting a nonlinear error resulting from the Doppler effect. Using this standard predicted value, predictive interpolation is performed on the first and second detection data sequentially with the passage of time, so as to provide first and second interpolated detection data. With this arrangement, it is possible to achieve improved response and detection performance with respect to dynamic characteristics. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01D 5/243

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 7/00 (2006.01); G01D 5/20 (2006.01); G01D 5/243 (2006.01); G01D 5/245 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01D 5/204 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054238 A2 20001122; EP 1054238 A3 20020327; EP 1054238 B1 20170712; JP 2000329505 A 20001130; JP 4355395 B2 20091028; US 2003033103 A1 20030213; US 6484120 B1 20021119; US 6571194 B2 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60049661

2017-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2017-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-01-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161219

2017-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01D 5/20 20060101AFI20161129BHEP

2017-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01D 5/243 20060101ALI20161129BHEP

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60049661

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G01D0005243000

- IPC: G01D0005200000

2014-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMITEQ CO., LTD.

2007-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070207

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI