Global patent index - EP 1054299 A1

EP 1054299 A1 2000-11-22 - Toner, toner production process, and image-forming method

Title (en)

Toner, toner production process, and image-forming method

Title (de)

Toner, Tonerherstellungsverfahren und Bildherstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Révélateur, procédé de préparation de révélateurs et procédé de production d' images

Publication

EP 1054299 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110431 A

Priority

  • JP 13538599 A
  • JP 2000127522 A

Abstract (en)

A toner is comprised of toner particles containing at least a binder resin, a colorant, a wax component and an oxycarboxylic acid. The toner satisfies the following conditions: <DFG> <DF>1.05 A/B 3.00, and </DF> <DF>0.15 B 3.50 </DF> </DFG> wherein A (mg) is a weight of oxycarboxylic acid extracted with methanol from 1 g of the toner, and B (mg) is a weight of oxycarboxylic acid extracted with an aqueous 0.1 mol/liter sodium hydroxide solution from 1 g of the toner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/097; G03G 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/02 (2006.01); G03G 5/047 (2006.01); G03G 5/05 (2006.01); G03G 9/08 (2006.01); G03G 9/087 (2006.01); G03G 9/097 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/09733 (2013.01); G03G 9/0806 (2013.01); G03G 9/0821 (2013.01); G03G 9/0825 (2013.01); G03G 9/0827 (2013.01); G03G 9/097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054299 A1 20001122; EP 1054299 B1 20080604; DE 60039089 D1 20080717; JP 2001034016 A 20010209; JP 4217365 B2 20090128

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140516

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130507

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090305

2008-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60039089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-07-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI