Global Patent Index - EP 1054313 A1

EP 1054313 A1 2000-11-22 - Temperature sensor

Title (en)

Temperature sensor

Title (de)

Temperaturfühler

Title (fr)

Capteur de température

Publication

EP 1054313 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00108752 A

Priority

DE 19918906 A

Abstract (en)

What is provided is a PTC heating register with a frame, at least one radiator element arranged in the frame, at least one PTC element and at least one temperature sensor for detecting the air entry temperature at the PTC heating register or the air exit temperature at the heat exchanger, the temperature sensor being arranged in a gap between the end of the at least one radiator element and the frame of the PTC heating register. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 23/24; B60H 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/04 (2006.01); H05B 3/14 (2006.01); H05B 3/16 (2006.01); H05B 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/0429 (2013.01); F24H 3/0405 (2013.01); F24H 3/0435 (2013.01); F24H 3/0447 (2013.01); F24H 3/047 (2013.01); F24H 9/1872 (2013.01); H05B 3/14 (2013.01); H05B 3/16 (2013.01); H05B 3/50 (2013.01); H05B 2203/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19918906 A1 20001109; DE 19918906 C2 20030717; EP 1054313 A1 20001122; EP 1054313 B1 20020911; ES 2182747 T3 20030316

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160408

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182747 T3

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-09-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI