Global patent index - EP 1054322 A2

EP 1054322 A2 2000-11-22 - Computer system with multiple operating system operation

Title (en)

Computer system with multiple operating system operation

Title (de)

Computersystem mit mehreren Betriebssystem-Betrieben

Title (fr)

Système d'ordinateur opérant avec plusieurs systèmes d'exploitations

Publication

EP 1054322 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304271 A

Priority

JP 14091499 A

Abstract (en)

A computer system is provided with a scheme to making the input and output device provided in a computer in common for a plurality of operating system, in a multiple operating system control unit operating a plurality of mutually distinct operating systems on one computer system. The computer system includes a plurality of operating systems, and OS switching unit for switching a plurality of operating systems. The OS switching means makes reference to a preferential interrupt table on the basis of an interrupt factor for switching to corresponding operating system and calls interrupt processing means incorporated in the operating system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/455 (2006.01); G06F 13/10 (2006.01); G01S 19/48 (2010.01); G06F 9/06 (2006.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 9/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/4812 (2013.01); G06F 9/45558 (2013.01); G06F 9/4843 (2013.01); G06F 2009/45579 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4993017 A 19910212 - BACHINGER GERHARD [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054322 A2 20001122; EP 1054322 A3 20031001; EP 1054322 B1 20150729; JP 2000330806 A 20001130; JP 3659062 B2 20050615; KR 100733852 B1 20070629; KR 20010014944 A 20010226; US 6615303 B1 20030902

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20160502

2016-05-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 60049024

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150729

2015-09-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 60049024

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2015-07-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2015-03-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: INTG

- Effective date: 20150217

2015-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G06F 9/48 20060101ALI20150126BHEP

2015-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G06F 9/455 20060101AFI20150126BHEP

2015-01-26 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 60049024

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06F0009460000

- IPC: G06F0009455000

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061107

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI