Global Patent Index - EP 1054337 A2

EP 1054337 A2 2000-11-22 - Virtual business card

Title (en)

Virtual business card

Title (de)

Virtuelle Visitenkarte

Title (fr)

Carte de visite virtuelle

Publication

EP 1054337 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00440131 A

Priority

DE 19923353 A

Abstract (en)

An electronically or mechanically readable address of a server connected to a telecommunications network is stored on a physically existing card. The card is fed by the user into a terminal which reads the stored address and contacts the server via this address. The server fetches the pertinent information from a business card database and transmits it to the user's terminal The terminal visually prepares the information in the form of a business card and outputs it to a display. A terminal and a server are also claimed.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zum Empfangen und Ausgeben von Information, insbesondere von Daten, wie sie üblicherweise auf Visitenkarten im geschäftlichen Verkehr aufgedruckt sind, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß auf einer physisch vorhandenen Karte eines Emittenten eine elektronisch oder mechanisch lesbare Adresse eines an ein Telekommunikationsnetz angeschlossenen Servers gespeichert wird, daß die Karte von einem Benutzer einem Terminal zugeführt wird, welches die gespeicherte Adresse liest und über diese Adresse Kontakt mit dem Server aufnimmt, daß der angesprochene Server aus einer Visitenkarten-Datenbank emittentenspezifische Information ausliest und an das Terminal des Benutzers sendet, und daß das Terminal die empfangene emittentenspezifische Information nach Art einer Visitenkarte des Emittenten optisch aufbereitet auf einer Ausgabe- oder Anzeigeeinheit ausgibt. Damit wird trotz physischen Austausches von Visitenkarten ein möglichst zeitnahes <IMAGE>Updating" der auf der Visitenkarte vorhandenen Informationen ermöglicht, wobei eine erheblich höhere Datenmenge als bei klassischen" Visitenkarten vom Emittenten der Karte an die jeweiligen Empfänger übermittelbar ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01); G06F 3/08 (2006.01); G06Q 99/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 99/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054337 A2 20001122; EP 1054337 A3 20020508; DE 19923353 A1 20001123

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021109

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI