Global Patent Index - EP 1054363 A1

EP 1054363 A1 2000-11-22 - Method and system for dispensing gas cylinders

Title (en)

Method and system for dispensing gas cylinders

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von Gasflaschen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de distribution de bouteilles de gaz

Publication

EP 1054363 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00430023 A

Priority

FR 9906677 A

Abstract (en)

Device has two or more access openings (2a, 2b, 2c) with a similar number of blocking flaps (16a-16c) for the openings. Clos sensors (14a-c) are associated with the flaps and a non- contact identification sensor (3) is associated with each bottle connec An electronic processing unit (UTED) is connected to the sensors (3) for identification of a bottle in a cell, its type and characteristics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/0609 (2013.01); F17C 2270/059 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054363 A1 20001122; FR 2793927 A1 20001124; FR 2793927 B1 20020524

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151201

2012-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20121113

2011-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUDCO

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI