Global Patent Index - EP 1054369 A1

EP 1054369 A1 2000-11-22 - Method for making packaging sleeves and resulting article

Title (en)

Method for making packaging sleeves and resulting article

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Verpackungshüllen und der hierdurch hergestellte Gegenstand

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de manchons d'emballage et article résultant

Publication

EP 1054369 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401343 A

Priority

FR 9906486 A

Abstract (en)

The channel or cover wrapping machine has a thermoplastic material (1) unwound from a drum in a continuous strip (2). The st is closed on itself under tension forming a cover (12). During the cover shaping process an adhesive is applied to the continuou strip and also a 1 square centimetre anti theft detection label is added to wrap the goods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/24; B31B 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/02 (2006.01); B31B 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/244 (2013.01); B31B 50/044 (2017.08); B31B 50/104 (2017.08); B31B 2241/00 (2013.01); B65D 2203/10 (2013.01); B65D 2211/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054369 A1 20001122; FR 2793770 A1 20001124; FR 2793770 B1 20010629

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071201

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030113

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI