Global Patent Index - EP 1054371 A1

EP 1054371 A1 2000-11-22 - Automatic alertsystem for vehicles

Title (en)

Automatic alertsystem for vehicles

Title (de)

Automatisches Notrufsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Système d'émission automatique d'appels d'urgence pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1054371 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106898 A

Priority

DE 19922730 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a transmitter (3) in the vehicle for automatically transmitting an emergency call to an external receiver sta and at least one transducer, both connected to a computer unit (1) that activates the emergency call when activated by a transdu signal. The emergency call system has an arrangement for determining a degree of probability of an imminent accident using the signals from the transducer and the emergency call can be activated if the degree of probability exceeds a threshold. An Independent claim is also included for a method of automatically transmitting an emergency call.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Notrufsystem eines Kraftfahrzeuges zur automatischen Übermittlung eines Notrufs an eine externe Empfangsstation vorgeschlagen. Das Kraftfahrzeug weist Meßmittel, beispielsweise in Form eines Radarsystems (6), auf zur Bestimmung der Relativgeschwindigkeit und des Abstandes des Fahrzeuges zu einem anderen Fahrzeug oder einem Hindernis. Überschreitet die aktuelle Relativgeschwindigkeit bei gegebenem Abstand einen vorgegebenen Grenzwert, so wird davon ausgegangen, daß eine Kollision unvermeidbar ist und es wird ein Notruf durch einen im Kraftfahrzeug vorhandenen Sender (3) aktiviert. Vorteilhafterweise wird mit dem Notruf die Fahrzeugposition, die über ein Navigationssystem (4) ermittelt wird, zur Empfangsstation übertragen. Ferner ist vorgesehen, daß das Notrufsystem mit weiteren Sensoren (6), die zur Detektion einer Kollision geeignet sind, in Verbindung stehen, so daß der Notruf widerrufen werden kann, wenn nicht innerhalb einer vorgegebenen Zeitspanne durch einen solchen Sensor eine tatsächliche Kollision gemeldet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/127; G08G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/127 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/205 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054371 A1 20001122; EP 1054371 B1 20040519; EP 1054371 B2 20070321; DE 19922730 A1 20001123; US 6339370 B1 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006457

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130331

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-10-05 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-06-20 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-03-21 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070321

2007-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Effective date: 20050218

2005-04-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Effective date: 20050218

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006457 P 20040624

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI