Global patent index - EP 1054373 A2

EP 1054373 A2 2000-11-22 - Display apparatus

Title (en)

Display apparatus

Title (de)

Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 1054373 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00660089 A

Priority

FI 991147 A

Abstract (en)

The object of the invention is a display apparatus comprising a display and, connected to the display (3), a base part which forms a support surface for supporting the display apparatus on a substantially planar surface. The display apparatus is characterised in that the display (3) and the base part can be moved in relation to each other, at least to a first operating position and to a second operating position, of which in the first operating position the direction of the support surface differs substantially 90 degrees from the direction of the support surface in the second operating position, and further the base part of the display apparatus comprises fastening means for fastening the display apparatus to a substantially planar surface. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G09F 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/00 (2013.01); G09F 27/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054373 A2 20001122; EP 1054373 A3 20010110; FI 991147 A0 19990520; FI 991147 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061201

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 09F 9/00 A, 7G 09F 27/00 B

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI