Global Patent Index - EP 1054375 A2

EP 1054375 A2 2000-11-22 - Device for billboards

Title (en)

Device for billboards

Title (de)

Anzeigeplakat

Title (fr)

Panneau d'affichage

Publication

EP 1054375 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00850086 A

Priority

SE 9901850 A

Abstract (en)

Device for billboards of the kind where the board has a hard firm surface to which the message can lie close, where the message is arranged in several lengths placed beside each other whose height is the same as that or the board, where the lengths overlap each other in their side edges and where every length belonging to the message can be put up and taken down separately, characterized by the fact that for each length there is a hoisting device mounted on the board on which the upper edge of the length can be applied when the hoisting device is in its lowest position near the lower edge or the board and that the hoisting device after that can be hoisted to its uppermost position with the length applied and in this position keep the length. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0006 (2013.01); G09F 15/0087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054375 A2 20001122; EP 1054375 A3 20010307; EP 1054375 B1 20060104; DE 60025325 D1 20060330; DE 60025325 T2 20061109; SE 518574 C2 20021022; SE 9901850 D0 19990521; SE 9901850 L 20001122

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080517

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080517

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025325 P 20060330

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI