Global Patent Index - EP 1054376 A2

EP 1054376 A2 2000-11-22 - Display apparatus

Title (en)

Display apparatus

Title (de)

Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de présentation

Publication

EP 1054376 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303734 A

Priority

GB 9911266 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to display apparatus for displaying items such as bottles in an attractable eye-catching manner. The apparatus comprises a base unit (10) onto which a bottle may be placed, a light source housed within the base unit (10) and arranged to illuminate the object through a light transmissive window (26), a supply of power (16) for powering the light source (14) and means for conveying power to a further base unit. The base units (10) are interlinkable in a daisy-chain fashion and configurable to form aesthetically pleasing display layouts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 19/12; G09F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/00 (2006.01); G09F 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/00 (2013.01); G09F 19/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054376 A2 20001122; EP 1054376 A3 20010131; GB 9911266 D0 19990714

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI