Global Patent Index - EP 1054417 A1

EP 1054417 A1 2000-11-22 - Microcomponents of microinductance or microtransformer type and manufacturing process

Title (en)

Microcomponents of microinductance or microtransformer type and manufacturing process

Title (de)

Mikrokomponente wie Mikroinduktanz oder Mikrotransformator und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Micro-composants du type micro-inductance ou micro-transformateur, et procédé de fabrication de tels micro-composants

Publication

EP 1054417 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420093 A

Priority

FR 9906433 A

Abstract (en)

The microcomponent manufacture technique has a substrate etched with a number of channels. Copper is deposited by electrolys in the channels and planed flat. A central section (12) is deposited above the segments (7). The central section is then etched for arch sections, each arc connected to an adjacent segment and forming a spiral winding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 41/04; H01F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 17/04 (2006.01); H01F 17/06 (2006.01); H01F 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/046 (2013.01); H01F 17/0033 (2013.01); H01F 41/042 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5884990 A 19990323 - BURGHARTZ JOACHIM NORBERT [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0727771 A2 19960821 - AIWA CO [JP]
  • [A] LOECHEL B ET AL: "SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, vol. A54, no. 1/03, pages 663-667, XP000637191, ISSN: 0924-4247

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054417 A1 20001122; CA 2308871 A1 20001118; FR 2793943 A1 20001124; FR 2793943 B1 20010713; JP 2000353617 A 20001219; US 6429764 B1 20020806

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031129

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI