Global Patent Index - EP 1054418 A1

EP 1054418 A1 2000-11-22 - Low voltage winding for electrical transformer and method for producing same

Title (en)

Low voltage winding for electrical transformer and method for producing same

Title (de)

Niederspannungswicklung für elektrischen Transformator und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Bobinage "basse tension" de transformateur électrique et son procédé de réalisation

Publication

EP 1054418 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00109330 A

Priority

FR 9906382 A

Abstract (en)

The low voltage electrical transformer has a metallic strip (1) wound in a spiral shape (10) with a thin outer layer of isolating material (2). The isolating edges are folded (5) pressing on the metallic strip, and covering the envelope edge covering the metallic strip path.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 41/06; H01F 27/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/32 (2006.01); H01F 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/323 (2013.01); H01F 41/063 (2016.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054418 A1 20001122; FR 2793942 A1 20001124; FR 2793942 B1 20020125

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-11-28 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI