Global patent index - EP 1054419 A1

EP 1054419 A1 2000-11-22 - High tension isolating switch with a mobile contact movable at high speed

Title (en)

High tension isolating switch with a mobile contact movable at high speed

Title (de)

Hochspannungstrennschalter mit schnellbeweglichem Kontakt

Title (fr)

Sectionneur haute tension à contact mobile déplacé à grande vitesse

Publication

EP 1054419 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401303 A

Priority

FR 9906212 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical circuit breaker has a moving contact section (2) and fixed contact port (1) and a rear rod (3), moving the mo contact. The rod moves the inner piston (5) in stages with a first (7) and second spring (6). The rod and spring system are lock (8) in a first position until the moving contact is connected to the fixed contact. The second spring is then released, pushing moving contact at speed into the fixed contact.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/30; H01H 31/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/64 (2006.01); H01H 3/30 (2006.01); H01H 31/00 (2006.01); H01H 31/32 (2006.01); H01H 33/12 (2006.01); H01H 33/40 (2006.01); H01H 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/3052 (2013.01); H01H 31/32 (2013.01); H01H 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054419 A1 20001122; EP 1054419 B1 20060816; CN 1171264 C 20041013; CN 1285604 A 20010228; DE 60030032 D1 20060928; DE 60030032 T2 20070215; FR 2793945 A1 20001124; FR 2793945 B1 20010622; ID 26059 A 20001123; JP 2000353457 A 20001219; KR 20010020851 A 20010315; TW 476080 B 20020211; US 6466420 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150506

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140512

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140512

2014-12-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20141201

2013-09-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130815 AND 20130821

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130412

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-08-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENTANWAELTE PAR, DE

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-06-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

2013-01-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENTANWAELTE PAR, DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-01-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20121204

2012-12-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

2012-12-05 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20121129

2007-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070518

2006-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60030032

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-09-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2006-08-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2004-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHUNIAUD, OLIVIER

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JOUARD, HENRI

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MARMONIER, JEAN

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: REGNIER, BERNARD

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI