Global patent index - EP 1054425 A1

EP 1054425 A1 2000-11-22 - Modular auxiliary electrical device, particularly for minimum operating voltage control

Title (en)

Modular auxiliary electrical device, particularly for minimum operating voltage control

Title (de)

Modulares elektrisches Hilfsgerät, insbesondere für Unterspannungsüberwachung

Title (fr)

Appareil électrique auxiliaire modulaire, notamment pour le cotrôle du minimum de tension

Publication

EP 1054425 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110364 A

Priority

IT MI991070 A

Abstract (en)

A modular auxiliary electrical device, particularly for minimum operating voltage control, includes a casing adapted to be associated with an electrical device, such as a circuit breaker, and includes an electrical connection means for connection to conducting components. The electrical connection means are connected to a kinematic system which is adapted to act on the associated electrical device. The auxiliary device includes a lever which is rigidly coupled to a movable portion of an armature of a relay and is suitable to actuate the kinematic means when the value of the supply voltage drops below a preset value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/12 (2013.01); H01H 2071/0278 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054425 A1 20001122; IT 1312446 B1 20020417; IT MI991070 A1 20001117

INPADOC legal status

2007-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070130

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060208

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010409

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI