Global patent index - EP 1054466 A2

EP 1054466 A2 2000-11-22 - Signal-processing apparatus for shifting phase of a signal inputted thereto and attenuating the signal

Title (en)

Signal-processing apparatus for shifting phase of a signal inputted thereto and attenuating the signal

Title (de)

Signalverarbeitungsgerät zur Phasenverschiebung eines Eingangssignals und zur Dämpfung dieses Signals

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement de signal pour décaler la phase d' un signal d' entrée et pour atténuer le signal

Publication

EP 1054466 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00401389 A

Priority

  • KR 19990017968 A
  • KR 19990033577 A

Abstract (en)

A signal-processing apparatus is capable of stably operating without regard to outside circumstances and miniaturizing. The signal-processing apparatus for shifting phase of a signal inputted thereto and attenuating the signal includes an input connector for inputting a signal; an output connector for outputting the signal; a rotation body to be rotated by the rotational force provided from the rotational force supplying means; a plurality of rotatable members respectively having a groove in peripheral portion, the rotatable members being coupled to peripheral portion of the rotation body so that the grooves communicate with each other; and a signal transmitting member for transmitting the inputted signal to the output connector, the signal transmitting member being located in the grooves and its both ends being respectively connected to the input and output connectors. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/18; H01P 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/18 (2006.01); H01P 1/22 (2006.01); H01P 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/184 (2013.01); H01P 1/227 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054466 A2 20001122; EP 1054466 A3 20020306; JP 2000353902 A 20001219; KR 20000075389 A 20001215; US 6392507 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051201

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR SE

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR SE

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI