Global Patent Index - EP 1054467 A1

EP 1054467 A1 2000-11-22 - Stripline directional coupler and method for adjusting its coupling factor

Title (en)

Stripline directional coupler and method for adjusting its coupling factor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Einstellung des Koppelfaktors eines Streifenleitungsrichtkopplers und Streifenleitungsrichtkoppler

Title (fr)

Coupleur directionnel à ligne microruban et méthode pour ajuster son facteur de couplage

Publication

EP 1054467 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106481 A

Priority

DE 19922831 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves encasing the strip conductors in a setting material (VM) whose quantity is selected to achieve a defined coupling factor. The circuit board is arranged in a housing that is filled with sufficient setting material that the required coupling factor is reached. An Independent claim is also included for a strip conductor directional coupler with at least two strip conductors on a circuit board.

Abstract (de)

Weil bei auf einer Leiterplatte angeordneten Streifenleitern die Koppelfaktoren infolge großer Toleranzen der Leiterplattenstärke, der Dicke und der Abstände der Streifenleiter stark streuen, ist der Ausschuß an StreifenleitungsKopplern mit einem außerhalb der vorgegebenen Toleranz liegenden Koppelfaktor verhältnismäßig hoch. Von der Erkenntnis ausgehend, dass eine Vergußmasse (VM) die elektrischen Eigenschaften eines StreifenleitungsKopplers (K) verändert, sind die Streifenleiter mit einer Vergußmasse (VM) vergossen, um gezielt einen vorgebbaren Koppelfaktor einzustellen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/184 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2284095 A 19950524 - GEN ELECTRIC [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 10 31 October 1996 (1996-10-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 12 31 October 1998 (1998-10-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 17, no. 487 (E - 1427) 3 September 1993 (1993-09-03)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054467 A1 20001122; EP 1054467 B1 20061122; DE 19922831 A1 20010628; DE 19922831 C2 20020124; DE 50013762 D1 20070104; US 6573806 B1 20030603

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090326

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090325

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090325

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013762 P 20070104

2006-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2006-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041018

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI