Global patent index - EP 1054471 A2

EP 1054471 A2 2000-11-22 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Stecker

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1054471 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109995 A

Priority

DE 19922560 A

Abstract (en)

A connector element (11) connects to an electric wire. A plug pin (13) has a connector section and plug section (25). The connector section makes a lasting connection with the connector element. The plug section serves as a detachable plug connection a contact socket. The connector element has a claw section (17) with claws (19) for clawing into the connector section.

Abstract (de)

Ein elektrischer Stecker besitzt ein Anschlußelement, das zum Anschluß an eine elektrische Leitung vorgesehen ist, und ferner einen Steckerstift, der einen Verbindungsabschnitt sowie einen Steckabschnitt aufweist. Der Verbindungsabschnitt ist für eine dauerhafte Verbindung mit dem Anschlußelement vorgesehen. Der Steckabschnitt dient zur lösbaren Steckverbindung mit einer zugeordneten Kontaktbuchse. Das Anschlußelement besitzt einen Krallabschnitt, der für eine Verkrallung mit dem Verbindungsabschnitt des Steckerstifts vorgesehen ist. Der Verbindungsabschnitt des Steckerstifts weist eine andere Querschnittsform auf als sein Steckabschnitt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/18; H01R 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/18 (2013.01); H01R 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054471 A2 20001122; EP 1054471 A3 20020626; EP 1054471 B1 20090826; DE 19922560 A1 20001123; DE 50015728 D1 20091008

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100511

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100511

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100511

2010-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100527

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091207

2009-10-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015728

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-10-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-08-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-12-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20081121

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI