Global Patent Index - EP 1054476 A1

EP 1054476 A1 2000-11-22 - Primary terminal retention feature for connectors

Title (en)

Primary terminal retention feature for connectors

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder mit Kontaktrückhaltemitteln

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique avec dispositif de rétention des contacts

Publication

EP 1054476 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110038 A

Priority

  • EP 00110038 A
  • EP 99109544 A

Abstract (en)

A connector for receiving terminals therein that includes a terminal block having outer side walls and opposing end walls, wherein terminal receiving passageways extend between the opposing end walls for receiving a terminal, and a primary retention member is disposed along at least one of the terminal receiving passageways that includes a resilient retention arm that extends into the passageway to retain the terminal therein, where the primary retention member is particularly adapted to situations where the spacing between the wall and the passageway is relatively small. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/426

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/426 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054476 A1 20001122; EP 1054476 B1 20040128

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60007916

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020628

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI