Global patent index - EP 1054478 A2

EP 1054478 A2 2000-11-22 - RF connector assembly for a circuit board

Title (en)

RF connector assembly for a circuit board

Title (de)

RF-Steckeranordnung für eine Leiterplatte

Title (fr)

Assemblage de connecteur RF pour un circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 1054478 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303869 A

Priority

GB 9911821 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a radio frequency (rf) connector assembly (1) for a circuit board (2), and in particular to an rf connector assembly. The connector assembly (1) comprises an elongate housing (3) that has a longitudinal axis (12) extending along the length of the housing (3) between a base end (6) and a top end (4) of the housing; a pair of rf connectors (13,14) held by the housing (3), each connector having a connection axis (28,29); and connection pins (19,20) that are connected electrically to the rf connectors (13,14) and which extend from the housing (3) for connection to a circuit board (2). The rf connectors (13,14) are spaced along the longitudinal axis (12) and face laterally outwards from the housing (3) with connection axes (28,29) that are transverse to the longitudinal axis (12); and the connection pins (19,20) extend from the housing (3) so that when the connector assembly (1) is mounted to a circuit board (2), the longitudinal axis (12) is transverse to the circuit board (2). The housing (3) is adapted to receive a first one (14) of the rf connectors through an opening (106) to the base end (6), and to receive a second one (13) of the rf connectors through another opening (144) to the front face (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/50 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054478 A2 20001122; EP 1054478 A3 20020306; GB 9911821 D0 19990721

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040430

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/646 A, 7H 01R 12/20 B

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI