Global Patent Index - EP 1054479 A1

EP 1054479 A1 2000-11-22 - Device for electrically connecting a coaxial line to a printed circuit board

Title (en)

Device for electrically connecting a coaxial line to a printed circuit board

Title (de)

Anordnung für eine elektrische Verbindung zwischen einer koaxialen Leitung und einer gedrückten Schaltungskarte

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour relier électriquement une ligne coaxiale à une carte de circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 1054479 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401396 A

Priority

FR 9906400 A

Abstract (en)

The coaxial line to printed circuit adapter has a printed circuit board (1) with tracks. An outer tubular section (9) on the coaxial connector connects to outer tracks. A central contact (11) connects to the central track. The external contact has two s and outer grips holding the circuit board, whilst the central contact grips the central circuit board section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/74 (2006.01); H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 107/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/50 (2013.01); H01R 12/721 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054479 A1 20001122; CN 1156944 C 20040707; CN 1274967 A 20001129; DE 1054479 T1 20010719; FR 2793955 A1 20001124; FR 2793955 B1 20010713; JP 2000353559 A 20001219; US 6238218 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070307

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-19 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-05-16 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI