Global patent index - EP 1054500 A1

EP 1054500 A1 2000-11-22 - Ventilation device for railway traction motor

Title (en)

Ventilation device for railway traction motor

Title (de)

Lüftungsvorrichtung für Elektromotorantrieb

Title (fr)

Dispositif de ventilation pour moteur éléctrique ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1054500 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401224 A

Priority

FR 9906213 A

Abstract (en)

Cooling air which has passed through a screen (22) is propelled by a centrifugal fan (24) on the main motor shaft through the rotor (5) using ducts (27) and also through the stator (8) which has larger rectangular ducts (31). A second centrifugal fan (28) also mounted on the main motor shaft assists in expelling the rotor air (F6) to atmosphere (F7) through ducts shared with the stator air (F8)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28B 9/08 (2006.01); F28B 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28B 9/08 (2013.01); F28B 9/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2645818 A1 19901019 - AMERICAN STANDARD INC [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054500 A1 20001122; FR 2793874 A1 20001124; FR 2793874 B1 20010622

INPADOC legal status

2003-02-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20021220

2001-08-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB IT LI

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI