Global Patent Index - EP 1054543 A2

EP 1054543 A2 2000-11-22 - System and method for providing services employing trusted site indicators, and mobile device capable of displaying the trusted site indicators

Title (en)

System and method for providing services employing trusted site indicators, and mobile device capable of displaying the trusted site indicators

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zum Bereitstellen von Diensten mit vertrauten Ortindikator, und Fahrbares Gerät zur Anzeige von ihnen

Title (fr)

Système et procédé pour fournir des services avec indicateurs de site sécurisé, et appareil mobile pour l'affichage des indicateurs

Publication

EP 1054543 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00110260 A

Priority

JP 14143399 A

Abstract (en)

A service providing system for verifying a source of information is disclosed. The system is composed of a computer network, at least one server connected to the computer network and sending information including a specified mark to the computer network, a communication carrier connected to the computer network and adding, when information received from the computer network includes the specified mark (Trusted Site Indicator tag), specified data (Trusted Site Indicator data) used to identify the server which has sent the information to the information, an mobile device provided with a proprietary display area which can not be edited or tampered by an unauthorized person, making wireless communication with the communication carrier and displaying the TSI data on the proprietary display area when receiving information includes the TSI data. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06; H04L 12/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 63/126 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3674 (2013.01); H04L 67/36 (2013.01); H04W 12/10 (2013.01); H04L 63/0807 (2013.01); H04W 88/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054543 A2 20001122; EP 1054543 A3 20030903; EP 1054543 B1 20050803; CA 2308908 A1 20001121; CA 2308908 C 20040413; CN 1259792 C 20060614; CN 1275020 A 20001129; DE 60021654 D1 20050908; DE 60021654 T2 20060608; HK 1034829 A1 20060113; US 7480800 B1 20090120

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140519

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140519

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100519

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090518

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-13 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034829

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021654 P 20050908

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI