Global Patent Index - EP 1054575 A2

EP 1054575 A2 2000-11-22 - Directional decoding

Title (en)

Directional decoding

Title (de)

Richtdekodierer

Title (fr)

Décodeur directionnel

Publication

EP 1054575 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304128 A

Priority

US 31305899 A

Abstract (en)

The degree of correlation between two audio signals is determined and the channels are normalised according to first and second normalisation modes responsive to correlation and uncorrelation respectively. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04S 3/00; H04S 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04S 3/00 (2006.01); H04S 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 5/005 (2013.01); H04S 2400/05 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1054575 A2 20001122; EP 1054575 A3 20020918; CN 100349497 C 20071114; CN 1281329 A 20010124; HK 1032705 A1 20080516; JP 2000350300 A 20001215

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20111107

2010-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20101013

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI